Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Supply-Sycamore Properties, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Northrup Linda L. Esq., against Haute Brand Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward L. Halm Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management20 days |
Filing DateMay 16, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions16 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time111 days |
SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER -
Date: May 16, 2018COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -
Date: May 16, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: June 01, 2018Summons
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 04, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.