Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Morgan Tamelah, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harrison Ralph E. Ii Esq., against Carrion Jr. Arcadio Gonzales, Edwards Iahmeail, Leonard Lucas As Trustee Of The Cora, Lucas Leonard, represented by Allen Carla D. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gus T. May presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGus T. May Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2018 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: May 19, 2021Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Status; Status Conference Trailing Probate ma...))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/05/2020)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Trailing Probate matter in 18STPB06039 (Com...))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Re The Cora Martin Rev...))
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Status Conference; Legacy Event T...))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.