Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maciel Alfred, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Rosner Hallen D. Esq., against Regency Usa Inc., The Western Surety Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Raphael Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2018 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNLA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)
Date: April 23, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 14, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: May 17, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.