Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lopez Gladys Barrios, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adam Zolonz Apc, against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward L. Halm Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2017 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time109 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: May 11, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Gladys Barrios Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: August 07, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-05-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Gladys Barrios Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Gladys Barrios Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Document:OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Gladys Barrios Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: August 07, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: October 01, 2018Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Gladys Barrios Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: October 01, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.