Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Grun Gavriel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adam Solonz Law Offices Of, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Greenberg Traugig Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert L. Hess presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert L. Hess Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time85 days |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: April 05, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 10, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 25, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 05, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: June 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: June 29, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 12, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: June 29, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 21, 2018Answer
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.