Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Health Connection Inc., filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) case against Dli Assets Llc, represented by Eandi Matthew Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara A. Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara A. Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management154 days |
Filing DateApril 05, 2018 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DLI Assets LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: American Health Connection, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: DLI Assets LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order; Notice of Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 21, 2021Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/12/2019)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order; Notice of Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order; Notice of Continuance) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/17/2018)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/04/2019)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice ( of (1) Appointment of Receiver; and (2) Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.