Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Marin John, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Murray Charles L. Iii Esq., against General Assembly Space Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gail Ruderman Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail Ruderman Feuer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time101 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: March 12, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT;
Date: March 12, 2018FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT (IC CONTRACT); ETC.
Date: March 23, 2018Complaint Filed by John Marin (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: June 27, 2018Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by John Marin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.