Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fitchey Cary, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Weisberg Rita, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert L. Hess presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert L. Hess Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: March 02, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 25, 2018Order for Publication
Date: May 01, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.