Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Douglas James, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gail Ruderman Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail Ruderman Feuer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time121 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Stay Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: February 22, 2018COMPLAINT (1) AGE DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: February 22, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 20, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 20, 2018DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: March 26, 2018NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: April 04, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 27, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 22, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.