Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
1990 Westwood Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cha Jason Esq., against Boshra Zakaria Taky, Hands On Medicine And Health, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gail Ruderman Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail Ruderman Feuer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time151 days |
COMPLAINT FOR RENT AND DAMAGES
Date: January 23, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 23, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 30, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 22, 2018NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE
Date: April 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: February 22, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 16, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 08, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL
Date: June 12, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: June 22, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: July 03, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 12, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 03, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.