Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Moya Marie, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Sklan Jeffrey F. Esq., against Corona Javier, Vasquez Jamie Corona, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael M. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Case Voided) |
Case Cycle Time37 days |
COMPLAINT-CONTRACT -
Date: January 10, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: January 25, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: January 11, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 02, 2018Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.