Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Castaneda Judith, Decker Tyler, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices Apc, against Fca Us Llc, Shaver Automotive Group Inc, represented by Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young Llp, Rasmussen Scali, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc Marmaro presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc Marmaro Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Disposition Type |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Outgoing Case Transfer Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 17, 2018Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 17, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: December 05, 2017COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS
Date: December 05, 2017FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS
Date: December 28, 2017Minute Order -
Date: January 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 05, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: January 09, 2018PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE
Date: February 26, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 09, 2018GENERAL DENIAL -
Date: March 06, 2018ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: March 09, 2018RULING
Date: March 09, 2018ORDER GRANTING FCA US LLC?S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO ORANGE COUNTY
Date: March 09, 2018NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO ORANGE COUNTY
Date: March 20, 2018NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER
Date: April 17, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: April 17, 2018NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER
Date: December 11, 2017Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Notice Filed by FCA US, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Tyler Decker (Plaintiff); Judith Castaneda (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Tyler Decker (Plaintiff); Judith Castaneda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00General Denial Filed by SHAVER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Clerk
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Outgoing Transfer Filed by Clerk
Date: April 17, 2018Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Tyler Decker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Order Filed by FCA US, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Tyler Decker (Plaintiff); Judith Castaneda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by FCA US, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Tyler Decker (Plaintiff); Judith Castaneda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Summons Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: December 08, 2017PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)
Date: December 15, 2017Order
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: April 17, 2018Receipt
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.