Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bush Theresa, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Portner Michael G. Esq., against California Department Of Corrections And, Contra Costa County Office Of Education, represented by Chung Alice H. Esq., Walsh Dennis J. Esq., Younger Jaclyn V. Deputy Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert B. Broadbelt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert B. Broadbelt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION BY REASON OF SEX (GOVERNMENT CODE I294O);ETC
Date: November 16, 2017SUMMONS -
Date: November 16, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 18, 2019Exhibit List
Date: July 18, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 23, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 29, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION EVIDENTIARY PACKAGE
Date: August 28, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: August 28, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISPUTED FACTS
Date: September 06, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CDCR MSJ
Date: September 06, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ...)
Date: September 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF HEARING
Date: September 13, 2019Order - ORDER RE: MSJ OR SA
Date: September 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF HEARING
Date: November 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ...)
Date: November 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS
Date: November 07, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CCCOE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 07, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION EVIDENTIARY PACKAGE IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 07, 2019Notice - NOTICE CONTINUATION OF HEARING
Date: November 20, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER
Date: November 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ...)
Date: November 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CRS 681734306089)
Date: November 25, 2019Order - ORDER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: December 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ...)
Date: December 11, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 11, 2019Order - ORDER RE: MSJ OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: December 20, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CRS 450457874262; HEAR...)
Date: December 20, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 21, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 27, 2020Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: February 25, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 29, 2020Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: April 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: July 21, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 17, 2020Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B304524
Date: October 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 30, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((DEFENDANTS' JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUIN...))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order on Ex Parte Application
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice ([re: Defendant's Joint Ex Parte To Continue Trial])
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00to Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order continuing Trial...))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Order (on Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael G. Portner in Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Affidavit (Compendium of Evidence in Support of Def. CDCR MSJ)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative ...))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff Separate Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposition)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Opposition (Evidentiary Package)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Order (re: MSJ or SA)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Reply ( to Plaintiffs Separate Statement of Additional Disputed Facts)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Defendant CDCR MSJ)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuation of Hearing)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative ...))
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuation of Hearing)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice (Continuation of Hearing)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative ...))
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Opposition (Evidentiary Package in Opposition)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Opposition ( to CCCOE's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Appeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified (NOA:02/25/20 B B304524)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 09, 2020Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order)
Date: 2019-11-23T00:00:00Order (Motion for Summary Judgement or Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Order (On Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:2/25/20)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice (RESPONDENT?S NOTICE ELECTING TO USE AN APPENDIX (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/21/2020)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment CRS 681734306089))
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment CRS 450457874262; Hear...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Order (re: MSJ or Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Stipulation to Continue T...))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ( ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -
Date: November 30, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: January 24, 2018DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: February 26, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: February 08, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 09, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 01, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: March 22, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: March 13, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 16, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: September 04, 2018Order - Order on Ex Parte Application
Date: November 20, 2018N0TICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (DEFENDANTS' JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUIN...)
Date: November 20, 2018Opposition - to Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: November 20, 2018Notice - Notice [re: Defendant's Joint Ex Parte To Continue Trial]
Date: November 21, 2018Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEF. CDCR MSJ
Date: June 27, 2019Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 27, 2019Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2019Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 17, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 18, 2019Separate Statement
Date: July 18, 2019Ex Parte Application (and Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 02/25/20 B304524)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:2/25/20)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative ...))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.