Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zuniga Marlyn, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Steve Lopez, against Montebello City Of, Tucker-Schuyler Francesca, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Frederick C. Shaller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick C. Shaller Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief Only (Not Domestic/Harassment) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions137 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 30, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 05, 2018Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: January 08, 2018Joinder
Date: July 05, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.