Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Blinkinsop Karen, Blinkinsop Robert, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Ashrafi Benno, against Albertons Companies Inc. Individually &, Brenntag North America Inc. Sued Indiv., Colgate-Palmolive Company Indiv & S-I-I, Cyprus Amax Minerals Indiv & S-I-I To, Imerys Talc America Inc. F K A, (total of 7) See All represented by Barnes & Thornburg Llp, Calfo Alexander Gerard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Peter J. Mirich presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter J. Mirich Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAsbestos- Personal Injury/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial515 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions585 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time553 days |
Complaint
Date: September 29, 2017Motion in Limine (to Preclude Evidence Regarding Asbestos "Cleavage Fragments" (MIL 26))
Date: January 18, 2019Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part I); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part III); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part V); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Other - CORRECTED Motion in Limine No. 13; Filed by: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Special Verdict (Defendants' Proposed Form); Filed by:
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Defendants' proposed Joint Statement of the case; Filed by: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Objection to Plaintiffs' Joint Witness List; Filed by: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part II); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part IV); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order; Signed and Filed by: Imerys Talc America, Inc., f/k/a (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOLLOWING JURY VERDICT; Filed by: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00ORDER RE JURY TRIAL RULES DEPT. SOUTH 29; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Defendants' Motions in Limine; Filed by: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VII); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by:
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 31, 2021Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Declaration Of Scott Brook, MD; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (Of Scott Brook, MD) Filed by Robert Blinkinsop (Plaintiff); Karen Blinkinsop (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Robert Blinkinsop (Plaintiff); Karen Blinkinsop (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Other - (CORRECTED Motion in Limine No. 13) Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Re: Blinkinsop-BC677764))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application of defendant, Johnson & Johns...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Joint Witness List) Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application of defendant, Albertsons Comp...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Trial Date Filed by Robert Blinkinsop (Plaintiff); Karen Blinkinsop (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order Filed by Imerys Talc America, Inc., f/k/a (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part III) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part II) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re: Blinkinsop-BC677764); Final Status Conference...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part V) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re: Blinkinsop-BC677764))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: June 22, 2022Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VII) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 18, 2022Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part I) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Blinkinsop-BC677764))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: August 31, 2021Jury Instructions (Given) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00JURY VERDICT FORM Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Re: Blinkinsop-BC677764))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00ORDER RE JURY TRIAL RULES DEPT. SOUTH 29 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Blinkinsop-BC677764); Further Status Conferenc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Defendants' proposed Joint Statement of the case Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Blinkinsop-BC677764)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOLLOWING JURY VERDICT Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part IV) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Robert Blinkinsop (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendants' Motions in Limine) Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other to Deem the February 4, 2019 Trial ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Declaration (Of Scott Brook, MD)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other to Deem the February 4, 2019 Trial ...))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Motion re: (to Deem the February 4, 2019 Trial Date a Preference Set Date Pursuant to CCP 36(D)(E))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9 to exclude foreign investigations and proceedings)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 to exclude references to media reports about talc litigation)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for pro hac vice admission of Meredith Thornburgh White)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for pro hac vice admission of Joel Thaddeus Larson)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (Of Kelly S. Olah In Support Of Defendant Albertsons Companies Inc. Motion In Limine)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application of defendant, Albertsons Comp...))
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use Visual Displays at Trial Pursuant)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order admitting Bruce Harley to appear as counsel)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (granting Ex Parte Application of Meredith Thornburgh White)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application of defendant, Johnson & Johns...))
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Defendant Albertsons Companies INC.'s notice of posting Jury Fees
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to use Visual Displays at Trial, Pursuant to Local Rule 3.97)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (granting Ex Parte Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joel Thaddeus Larson)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Order (Granting Ex Parte Application Admitting Bruce Hurley to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Opinions of Brian Daly based on Speculation and Pseudoscience (MIL 25))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Expert Opinion by Dr. Richard Attanoos, MBBS (MIL 24))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Dr. Suresh Moolgavkar's Speculation (MIL 23))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Other - (CORRECTED Motion in Limine No. 13)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion in Limine No. 10 to Exclude any Argument Talc is Safe)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (CORRECTED (E-mail /Electronic Transmission))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Re: Blinkinsop-BC677764)))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (Of Julia E. Romano In Support of Defendants' Motion In Limine No.17; Exhibits)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Declaration (Of Julia A. Romano In Support Of Motion in Limine No. 15 To Exclude All Evidence)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Trial Brief (regarding privileged marital communications of Imerys employee, Julie Pier)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Defendants' proposed Joint Statement of the case
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Defendant Johnson & Johnson consumer Inc.'s trial Brief
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Use Visual Aids at Trial per Los Angeles Local Rule 3.97)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Julia E. Romano in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs MIL No. 23)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 23 to Exclude Dr. Suresh Moolgavkar)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Trial Brief (on Post Exposure Conduct and Documents)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re: Blinkinsop-BC677764); Final Status Conference...))
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Joint Witness List)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part I)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice (of Suggestion of Pendency of Banckruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part III)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part II)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part IV)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part V)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re: Blinkinsop-BC677764)))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Blinkinsop-BC677764)))
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Blinkinsop-BC677764); Further Status Conferenc...))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Other - (Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Proposed Special Verdict Form)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00ORDER RE JURY TRIAL RULES DEPT. SOUTH 29
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VII)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendants' Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Blinkinsop-BC677764))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (regarding Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (, K. Darlene Lewis, No. 13534)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (, Mark Schweitzer, No. 10514)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00ECONOMIC DAMAGES STIPULATION
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00STIPULATION ON NETWORTH
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING EVIDENCE CODE 721
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00JOINT LIST OF ADMITTED EXHIBITS
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Jessica Davis, No. 12646)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00JURY VERDICT FORM
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00JOINT LIST OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (REGARDING POST-TRIAL MOTIONS, APPEAL AND COSTS)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.