Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ayala Lizbeth, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lovasz Christopher M., against Volkswagen Group Of America, Volkswagen Of Downtown L.A. Lp, Volkswagen Of Downtown La, represented by Chavos & Rau Aplc, Squire Patton Boggs Us Lp, Conboy Sean P. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael M. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2017 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time143 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 12, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 28, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 14, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.