Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dobias Wayne, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group Llp, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Snell & Wilmer Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael M. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2017 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: September 27, 2017Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: October 10, 2017Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 14, 2017COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY- VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT ;ETC
Date: September 06, 2017DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF WAYNE DOBIAS'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: October 10, 2017OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.