Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Medina Juana C., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Casas J.B. Jr. Esq., against Carrllo Carlos O, Loera Sofia, represented by Tusken Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Wada presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Wada Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management746 days |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions746 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time746 days |
Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CARLOS O CARRLLO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: September 09, 2019Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SOFIA LOERA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by JUANA C MEDINA on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice
Date: September 09, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: September 09, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.