Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alvarez Luis, Renteria Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Howell Jonathan Edward, Saeltzer Douglas Senger, against Alvarez Luis Sr., Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Wright-Conkelton Vanessa Rachelle, Wright-Conkleton Vanessa Rachelle, represented by O'Reilly Paul Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary Ann Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary Ann Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions643 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time628 days |
Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by:
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Opposition to Motion; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Opposition opposition to motion limine; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: MARIA RENTERIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Maria Renteria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6); Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge Murphy, Dept. 25, Central, OTR forthwith; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Maria Renteria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Maria Renteria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Luis Alvarez (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Alvarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions Refused; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Declaration of Douglas S Saelzter; Filed by: Maria Renteria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Jury Question Deliberating Jury #1; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Jury Question Deliberating Jury #2; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial and FSC)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.1 motion to exclude all evidence of the contents of decedent Luis Alvarez Backpack)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice (of intent to use portions of video deposition)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.2 motion to exclude all evidence of marijuana use)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4: Motion To Exclude Character Evidence Of Vanessa Wright conkleton)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.3 Motion to Exclude reference to type or brand of bicycle decedent was operating)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Murphy, Dept. 25, Central, OTR forthwith)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Jury Question (Deliberating Jury #1)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Jury Question (Deliberating Jury #2)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Refused)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: June 07, 2019Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: July 10, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: June 26, 2019Declaration (of Douglas S Saelzter)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review; notice of entry of judgment;))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.