Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
California Business Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Love Franklin Jay Esq., against Jeronimo Gloria, Jeronimo Isauro, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc Marmaro presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc Marmaro Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time123 days |
Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: June 05, 2018Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: June 05, 2018Writ of Execution ((Sacramento))
Date: June 03, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.