Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S London, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Schrieffer Paul Karsten Esq., against Allstate Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, represented by Guslani Lawrence Mario, Mcpherson Mary Elizabeth Esq., Stone Sandra Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan Bryant-Deason Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management279 days |
Filing DateMay 24, 2017 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial378 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions245 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeOther Court-Ordered Dismissal |
Case Cycle Time523 days |
PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: February 21, 2018EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF STATE FARM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: April 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: July 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AND EMAIL - ALLSTATE?S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS:1,6 AND 7
Date: July 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF MAILING FOR MOTION IN LIMINE DOCUMENTS
Date: July 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (MOTION FOR BIFURCATION)
Date: July 26, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: June 29, 2017STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: July 11, 2017DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S GENERAL DENIAL TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL SERVICE)
Date: April 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (U.S. MAIL)
Date: April 25, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: April 30, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: May 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AND EMAIL
Date: May 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AND EMAIL
Date: June 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AND EMAIL
Date: July 06, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AND EMAIL
Date: July 13, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (and Email)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Request for Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal))
Date: October 26, 2018Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: September 06, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: September 28, 2018Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: September 20, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.