Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carter Chase Matthew, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Muller Robert J., against Carter Wendy Joy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Brenda M. Penny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrenda M. Penny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management160 days |
Filing DateApril 11, 2017 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time801 days |
COMPLAINT FOR: (1) FRAUD; ETC
Date: April 11, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: March 11, 2019Order
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: June 21, 2019Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Further Status Conference)
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: January 11, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.