Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fewell Kenneth R., filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Kielty Thomas William, against Clark Builders Group Lp Doe 4, Clark Builders Lp, Clark Construction Group, Clark Llc, Clark Realty Builders Inc., (total of 11) See All represented by Adams Catherine, Glaser Joel Perry, Gonda Gayle, Meyers Alaya Ben Esq., Herrera Jose M., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 28, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 14, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 21, 2021SUMMONS - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 10, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 12, 2017MESSENGER PROOF OF SERVICE BY HAND DELIVERY OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: August 10, 2017Proof of Service Not Plaintiff’s / Defendant’s Claim
Date: March 18, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 08, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 21, 2022COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: March 28, 2017DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2017COMPLAINT-WRONGFUL TERMINATION
Date: April 10, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: May 16, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: June 09, 2017Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: October 09, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 06, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (5TH)
Date: June 24, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 05, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 08, 2020REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: June 13, 2017ORDER
Date: June 28, 2017CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 16, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: July 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: October 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 06, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 26, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY ISO AUTO EXT
Date: March 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2021Order - ORDER LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: June 18, 2021Answer
Date: June 25, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 08, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 15, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 06, 2021Answer
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 22, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 18, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 14, 2022Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 05, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: July 26, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS
Date: August 01, 2022Status Report
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: December 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: January 31, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint (3rd))
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:001st Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((3rd))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Order (Leave to Amend)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring Party ISO auto ext)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Answer (TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Leave to Amend)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 07, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.