Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gughemetti Helen By And Through Her, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Stuhr & Miller Llp, against Ayuso Mary Catherine Individually And, Cullen Deborah Individually And As, represented by Cyril Lawrence Inc. Aplc, Evans Latham & Campisi, Parker Milliken Clark O'Hara & Samuelian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Brenda M. Penny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrenda M. Penny Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2017 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time911 days |
Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Motion to Transfer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Incoming Case Transfer Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Reimbursement of Fees Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Reimbursement of Fees
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: July 10, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-02-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 21, 2019Notice (of Disassociation of Counsel)
Date: March 25, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.