We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Case Details

Filing Date

November 09, 2016

Last Refreshed

May 16, 2022

Filing Location

Los Angeles County, CA

Filing Court House

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Judge

Craig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Malpractice

Matter Type

Unknown Disposition

Time To Management

631 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

583 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Defendants

Attorneys for Defendants

Case Documents

Notice

Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00

Motion for Summary Judgment

Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00

Separate Statement

Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00

Motion to Strike

Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00

Notice of Settlement

Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00

First Amended Complaint

Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00

Miscellaneous-Other

Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00

Minute Order ( (Court Order))

Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal-Partial

Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00

Reply (Reply ISO Motion to Strike)

Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00

Reply (Reply ISO Demurrer)

Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00

Answer to Amended Complaint

Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00

Complaint

Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00

Motion

Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00

Demurrer

Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00

Receipt

Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00

Application

Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00

Declaration

Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00

Order

Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00

Proof-Service/Summons

Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00

Demurrer

Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00

Motion to Strike

Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00

Summons

Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00

Order

Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00

Complaint ((2nd))

Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00

Separate Statement

Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00

Declaration (OF TRIAL ATTORNEY )

Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00

Motion for Summary Judgment

Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00

Miscellaneous-Other

Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S

Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00

Declaration

Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00

Order

Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00

Statement-Case Management

Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00

Judgment

Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00

Separate Statement

Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00

Notice of Continuance

Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00

Declaration (OF TRIAL ATTORNEY )

Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00

Demurrer

Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00

Demurrer

Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00

Motion to Strike

Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00

Declaration

Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00

Ex-Parte Application

Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00

Miscellaneous-Other

Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00