Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Medina Ramon, Sully-Miller Contracting Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ryneal Fred Steve, Tseng Jennifer Tina Esq., against Blue Diamond Materials, Mbmtz Trucking G.F.S., John Payne Inc., Morales Manuel G.F.S, represented by Faenza Christopher Edward, Felchlin Peter Wakem, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Charles F. Palmer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Palmer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions598 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1091 days |
Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash Notice Of Motion; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Ramon Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Ramon Medina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Ex Parte on 1-18-19; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defend/XDefen/XComp
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF RULING; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6); Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Total Costs: 8417.76
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Document:Rq for Determ of Good Faith Setlmt Filed by: Attorney for Defend/XDefen/XComp
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Rq for Determ of Good Faith Setlmt Filed by: Attorney for Defend/XDefen/XComp
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Notice Notice of Related Cases; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Opposition To Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Ramon Medina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B302301; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 10, 2020Brief AMENDED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JURY TRIAL; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Brief BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JURY TRIAL; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter: STATEMENT OF DECISION) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B302301; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 06, 2020Complaint Filed by Ramon Medina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Manuel (G.F.S) Morales (Legacy Party); MBMTZ Trucking (G.F.S.) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Manuel (G.F.S) Morales (Legacy Party); MBMTZ Trucking (G.F.S.) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Manuel (G.F.S) Morales (Legacy Party); MBMTZ Trucking (G.F.S.) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Summons Filed by Manuel (G.F.S) Morales (Legacy Party); MBMTZ Trucking (G.F.S.) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Ramon Medina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Notice Of Motion) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Related Cases) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ramon Medina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to consolidate c...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF RULING) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Witness List Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion to Consolidate) Filed by Ramon Medina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (X-C of Sully-Miller Contracting Co. ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Document:Statement of Damages Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: John Payne, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Order regarding right to Jury Trial on contractual indemnity claim; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order deeming cases re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Hearing on Ex Parte Applica...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Witness List Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (X-C of Sully-Miller Contracting Co. ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Brief (AMENDED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JURY TRIAL) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Brief (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JURY TRIAL) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (X-C of Sully-Miller Contracting Co. ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Order regarding right to Jury Trial on contractual indemnity claim Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: ORDER REGARDING RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL ON CONTRACTU...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6) Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re submission of Tentative Statement of Dec...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Closing Arguments))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Tentative Statement of Decision)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Closing Arguments))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Sully Miller?s Proposals or Objections to the...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Statement of Decision Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter: STATEMENT OF DECISION)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter: STATEMENT OF DECISION) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Appellant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B302301) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 06, 2020Notice (OF JUDGMENT) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B302301) Filed by Clerk
Date: March 10, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by John Payne, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice (Abandonment of Appeal) Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Appellant)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Notice Of Motion)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to consolidate c...))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Introduce Excerpts of Deposition to be Used in Lieu of Live Testimony)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order to consolidate cases and continue the fscand trial dates)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte on 1-18-19)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order deeming cases re...))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Brief (AMENDED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (X-C of Sully-Miller Contracting Co. ...))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: ORDER REGARDING RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL ON CONTRACTU...))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Brief (In Support of Its Request for Bench Trial on Its Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion to Consolidate)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Hearing on Ex Parte Applica...))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (X-C of Sully-Miller Contracting Co. ...))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Objection (to John Payne, Inc.'s Demands to Appear)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (X-C of Sully-Miller Contracting Co. ...))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Brief (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Order regarding right to Jury Trial on contractual indemnity claim
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B302301)
Date: March 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter: STATEMENT OF DECISION) of 07/17/2019)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:11/8/19)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Sully Miller?s Proposals or Objections to the...))
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re submission of Tentative Statement of Dec...))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Reply (TO SULLY-MILLER?S OBJECTION TO [PROPOSED] TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Jorge Dominguez, Csr#12523)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Tentative Statement of Decision))
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Brief (In Support of the Enforcement of the Indemnity Provision in the Contract)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Objection (SULLY'S OBJECTION TO PROPOSED TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 11/08/19 B302301)
Date: January 06, 2020Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Closing Arguments)))
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Closing Arguments)))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/01/2019)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter: STATEMENT OF DECISION))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice (Abandonment of Appeal)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice (OF SCHEDULING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL)
Date: July 23, 2020Notice (OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.