Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hijazi Tanya, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Firm Shining Law, Ramey John F. Esq., Ramey Christa Haggai, against Birkenshaw Ann, Birkenshaw James Robert, Food Forward Inc., James R. Birkenshaw Trust The, Birkenshaw Jj, (total of 6) See All represented by Mccormick Gregory Hess, Miller Weyd-Anne N., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Peter J. Mirich presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter J. Mirich Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions205 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time860 days |
Proof of Service Personal Service -
Date: June 22, 2017Opposition - Defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion in limine no.1
Date: October 04, 2018Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine #2
Date: October 04, 2018Motion in Limine - NO. 3
Date: October 05, 2018Motion in Limine -
Date: October 09, 2018Motion in Limine -
Date: October 10, 2018Motion in Limine - NO. 5
Date: October 12, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 4
Date: October 12, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4
Date: October 17, 2018Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 7
Date: October 17, 2018Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4
Date: October 17, 2018Notice - Notice of withdrawal of defendant's motion in limine no. 6
Date: October 19, 2018Notice - Notice of withdrawal of defendant's motion in limine no. 1
Date: October 19, 2018Motion in Limine - Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 12; Proposed Order
Date: October 29, 2018Motion in Limine - Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 13; Proposed Order
Date: October 29, 2018Motion in Limine - Amended Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 13; Proposed Order
Date: October 29, 2018COMPLAINT FOR INJURY 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISE LIABILITY
Date: August 31, 2016Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: September 27, 2016FOOD FORWARD, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2016DECLARATION OF MAX WELLMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 23, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST FOOD FORWARD, INC.
Date: February 23, 2017RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine #2 to Exclude any and all References to Plaintiff's Prior Drug and Alcohol Use
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Defendant's No. 2)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Defendant's No. 3)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Defendants' motion in LIMINE#1)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Defendant's no. 1)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion in limine no.1)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial;)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Of Out- Of-State Case Law)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial and Final Status Conference Date;)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue the Trial and Final Status C...))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine no. 2
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Food Forward Inc.'s Notice of Association Of Counsel)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Other - (Joint Statement Of The Case)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Other - (- Joint Witness List)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 3
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Other - (- Joint Exhibit List)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Other - (- Joint [Proposed] List Of Jury Instructions)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Declaration (Gianne Ramirez)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION RTO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Declaration (Weyd-Anne Miller)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte to exclude Christopher Money from testifying)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For an order excluding Christopher K. Money from testifying at trial)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application to exclude Amy Koellner from testifying)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Plaintiff's ex parte application for an order excluding defen...))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE 3)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Trial Brief (Tanya Hijazi's Trial Brief)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Notice (Of Association Of Cousel)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Other - (Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Sec. 170.6))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 13; Proposed Order
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Amended Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 13; Proposed Order
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Peter Mirich, Department S29, Long Beach)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice (of withdrawal of defendant's motion in limine no. 1)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF ON ADMISSIBILITY OF THE WAIVER/RELEASE
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 12; Proposed Order
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of withdrawal of defendant's motion in limine no. 6)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF THE RELEASE
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF BIFURCATION
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial In Progress))
Date: November 07, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: January 03, 2019Minute Order ((Jury Trial In progress))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF ON THE ISSUE OF CAL-OSHA APPLICABILITY TO NON-EMPLOYEES
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OSHA APPLICABILITY TO NON-EMPLOYERS.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF ON THE ISSUE OF CACI NO. 472 AND THE ADMISSIBILITY OF THE SIGNED WAIVER
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 08, 2019DEFENDANT'S SECOND BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF THE RELEASE
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial in progress))
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial in progress))
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: January 08, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.