Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kent Jennifer, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Bailey Lindsay M. Deputy Atty. General, against Bermudez Leticia, Alvidrez Sylvia, Alvidrez Aleene, Alviddrez Arnold, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maria E. Stratton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria E. Stratton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management104 days |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2016 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: March 10, 2017Notice of Related Case Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)
Date: March 10, 2017Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.