Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Blue Bridge Financial Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Law Offices Of Glass & Goldberg, against Lee Clement K, Optmal Health & Wellness Corp, represented by Shar Stanley, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRafael A. Ongkeko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time379 days |
Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: October 31, 2016Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: December 13, 2016COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC
Date: July 20, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 03, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: August 01, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.