Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ali Tatyana Marisol, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brown James Leonard Esq., against Bouttier Sheila, Mclouiglin Hilary Estey, Telepictures, Telepictures Productions, Warner Bros. Domestic Television Distri-, (total of 7) See All represented by Godley Tamerlin J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time244 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 30, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2016COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: July 15, 2016FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: September 12, 2016SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2016SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: December 20, 2016Motion for an Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: March 16, 2017Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: March 24, 2017Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Summons Issued Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Notice Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Time Warner (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Time Warner (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Time Warner (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Time Warner (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Time Warner (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: March 24, 2017Second Amended Complaint Filed by Tatyana Marisol Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 24, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.