Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anderson Lonisha, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Panish Brian J. Esq., Turner C Tab, against Conley Dhati Mack, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc., Walker Willie, represented by Galvin Vincent Jr. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth R. Feffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management480 days |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions600 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time882 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 03, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 09, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 21, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-10-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: July 31, 2018Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: October 01, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: September 21, 2018Notice
Date: August 16, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 13, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.