Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nguyen Christopher V., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lee David I. Esq., Ramey Christa Haggai, against Young Kelsey Julia, represented by Muench Richard Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Gary Y. Tanaka presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary Y. Tanaka Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1057 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1057 days |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Other - Judgment on Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B299740; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B299740; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Darlene Lewis CSR #13534; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge Tanaka, Dept. A, Torrance, OTR at 9:00 a.m. Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Affidavit Election to forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6); Filed by: Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment on Special Verdict; Filed by: Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B299740; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) for Notice of Appeal, filed ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 11, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-06-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: December 11, 2019Association of Attorney Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Summons Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Other - (Judgment on Special Verdict) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Tanaka, Dept. A, Torrance, OTR at 9:00 a.m.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Amended Judgment on Special Verdict Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: December 11, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: FOR FAILURE TO FILE A JUDGMENT AFTER ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B299740) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (for Notice of Appeal, filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: January 25, 2021Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Darlene Lewis CSR #13534) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Affidavit (Election to forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6)) Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment on Special Verdict) Filed by Kelsey Julia Young (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B299740) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Christopher V. Nguyen (Appellant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B299740) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE ALL REFERENCES OR STATEMENTS CONCERNING THE "GOLDEN RULE" ARGUMENT)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Order (Re: Ex Parte Application for Continuing the Trial Date)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Requesting an order to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INSTRUCTION 2)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 To exclude evidence of and/or reference to defendant's liability insurance)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO PROHIBIT PLAINTIFF FROM ARGUING/IMPOSING AN IMPROPER STANDARD OF CARE)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INSTRUCTION 3)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INSTRUCTION 1)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING OF DEFENDANT'S CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 998 STATUTORY OFFERS TO COMPROMISE)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Tanaka, Dept. A, Torrance, OTR 03/25/2019 at 9:00 a.m.)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment on Special Verdict)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Other - (Judgment on Special Verdict)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: FOR FAILURE TO FILE A JUDGMENT AFTER ...))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Darlene Lewis CSR #13534)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (for Notice of Appeal, filed 8/6/19)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Affidavit (Election to forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/15/2019)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs; Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Objection (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF VERDICT AND NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:08/06/19 B299740)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B299740)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:08/06/19 B299740)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Amended Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.