Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walker Petal, Williams Petronella, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Johnson Joy M. Esq., against Banasheha Josh, Brius Management Co., Bsd Construction Llc, Lalezarian Shlomo, S & E Real Estate Investments Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Trenk Joseph Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard E. Rico Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management506 days |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions937 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time937 days |
Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Application
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Application
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: February 04, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Offer to Compromise
Date: September 06, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: January 03, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference) of 01/04/2019)
Date: January 04, 2019Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: November 05, 2018Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: January 04, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.