Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hernandez Perla Alvarez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ekizian Tamar A., Ekizian Tamar A. Law Offices, against Deerbrook Enterprise Corporation, Does 1 To 20, Du Xingmeng Dismissed, Du Xingmeng, represented by Shaffery John Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenny C. Osorio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDism Lack Prosecutn Per 581A & 583 |
Case Cycle Time549 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 19, 2016Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Perla Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: March 28, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-11-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Perla Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Deerbrook Enterprise Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Deerbrook Enterprise Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: January 08, 2018Statement of Facts (SEP STMT IN SUPP OF MTC FURTHER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Perla Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Motion (MTC FURTHER 6006 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Deerbrook Enterprise Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 28, 2018Complaint
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Statement of Facts (SEP STMT IN SUPP OF MTC FURTHER )
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT XINGMENG DU ONLY )
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion (MTC FURTHER 6006 )
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.