Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bolanos Maria Elena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martinian Tigran Esq., against Adair Jeffery Scottgfs-Pltf Bolanos, Ernie'S Mobile Home Transport Inc., Round Trip Trans Inc., Sanchez Aaron Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time838 days |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC
Date: July 08, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: October 02, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: August 21, 2018Application
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Order
Date: August 21, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2017-01-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Ord-Apprv Minor's Comp Claim
Date: August 21, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.