Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gordon Kimberly, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by Albertson & Davidson Llp, against Does 1-30, Gordon Arthur, represented by Jannol Henry N. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maria E. Stratton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria E. Stratton Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2016 |
CategoryElder/Dependent Adult Abuse Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time231 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: September 15, 2016VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2016Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: September 20, 2016Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Order
Date: September 29, 2016Receipt (jury fees )
Date: September 29, 2016OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with prejudice complaint )
Date: January 18, 2017Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (16STPB01016 PROBATE DEPT 5 (FORWARDED TO DEPT 1) )
Date: October 04, 2016Notice-Related Cases ( 16stpb01016 dept. 5 6/1/16 )
Date: November 04, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.