Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Abeyta Donna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Madrigal Jose Nava, represented by Belofsky & Hanker, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Charles F. Palmer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Palmer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time680 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 29, 2016DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. 1-6
Date: February 02, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PROPERTY DAMAGE
Date: December 05, 2016ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: December 05, 2016ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2017Proof of Publication
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Application
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 15, 2018General Verdict
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: February 27, 2018Jury Question
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: February 16, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.