Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia Arnold Josue, Garcia Miguel, Garcia Reina, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Filmer Campbell Walter, Johnson Stephen Michael Esq., Vieira Anthony Edwin, against Eddies Trucking & Messenger Service Llc, Edward Barsoun, Gray Tommie Jerome, Hrant Vartzbedian, represented by Booth Hillary Arrow Esq., Culver Ian Paul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael I. Levanas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael I. Levanas Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1166 days |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Vartzbedian Hrant (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Order re Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff); Reina Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B300661; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 28, 2021Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Hillary Arrow Booth; Filed by: Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal for Notice of Appeal, filed ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time NOA: B300661; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant); Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B300661, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 21, 2019Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff); Reina Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Miguel Garcia (Appellant)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict; Filed by: Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff); Reina Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep NOA: B300661; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 14, 2020DECLARATION OF HILLARY ARRO BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINENO. 7
Date: January 23, 2018DECLARATION OF HILLARY BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: January 23, 2018DECLARATION OF HILLARY ARROW BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: January 23, 2018DECLARATION OF HILLARY ARROW BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: January 23, 2018DECLARATION OF HILLARY ARROW BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE
Date: January 23, 2018DECLARATION OF HILLARY ARROW BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE
Date: January 24, 2018REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT
Date: January 31, 2018PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES; ETC
Date: February 09, 2018REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES
Date: February 16, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES
Date: February 22, 2018DECLARATION OF HILLARY ARROW BOOTH IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: April 23, 2018DECLARATION OF HILLARY ARROW BOOTH IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION INLIMINE NO. 1
Date: April 23, 2018DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 9 TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY BY DOUGLAS SHAPIRO
Date: April 23, 2018ORDER RE:MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY AND DAMAGES AT TRIAL
Date: April 27, 2018Motion for New Trial
Date: August 01, 2019Opposition - DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: August 09, 2019Opposition - DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: August 23, 2019DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 06, 2016DEFENDANT TOMMIE JEROME GRAY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: May 08, 2018DEFENDANT HRANT VARTZBEDIAN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 2018Receipt Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service -
Date: May 17, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL
Date: May 21, 2018Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant); Eddies Trucking & Messenger Service, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant); Eddies Trucking & Messenger Service, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA: B300661) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Order (re Motion to Tax Costs) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Hillary Arrow Booth) Filed by Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Miguel Garcia (Appellant); Reina Garcia (Appellant)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep (NOA: B300661) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 14, 2020Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff); Reina Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff); Reina Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B300661, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Miguel Garcia (Appellant); Reina Garcia (Appellant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant); Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (for Notice of Appeal, filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Settlement or Ruling on Motion ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion for New Trial Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff); Reina Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B300661) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 28, 2021Judgment on Special Verdict Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Trial) Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Motion re: - MOTION RE: NONSUIT
Date: June 14, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: August 07, 2019Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: August 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS; HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: September 06, 2019Order - ORDER RE MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: September 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: September 13, 2019Motion in Limine Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff); Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Objection Filed by Vartzbedian Hrant (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eddies Trucking & Messenger Service, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Vartzbedian Hrant (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Vartzbedian Hrant (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant); Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice Filed by Tommie Jerome Gray (Defendant); Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Barsoun Edward (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Miguel Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Vartzbedian Hrant (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Levanas, Dept. D, Santa Monica, OTR on at 9:00 a.m.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion for New Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Statement-Non-Agreement
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application for...))
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Levanas, Dept. D, Santa Monica, OTR on 05/31/2019 at 9:00 a.m.)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/25/2019)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Hillary Arrow Booth)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Ian P. Culver)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Order (re Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 9/6/19)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA:09/06/19 B300661)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Settlement or Ruling on Motion ...))
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B300661, NOA 9/6/19;)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep (NOA: 09/06/19 B300661)
Date: January 14, 2020Reply (Appellants' Reply Brief)
Date: August 26, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.