Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Schneier Ronna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Berkley Berkley, Mcreynolds C.R. Esq., against Thornton William, represented by Robinson David E. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Norman P. Tarle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman P. Tarle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time715 days |
Receipt
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 20, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference : Final Status Conference; Case Settled))
Date: February 20, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-20 00:00:00
Date: February 20, 2018Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.