Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Akimoto Nao, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rubin Tal, Zaret Thomas C. Esq., against Does 1 Through 10, Hernandez Ocea S., La Salle Plumbing Heating And Air-, represented by Mayers Darren G., Ross Jonathan A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Norman P. Tarle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman P. Tarle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial713 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time753 days |
Jury Question (for expert witness Dr, Nicholas Rose from jurors 3,5, 6, 12, & Alt #2 )
Date: January 31, 2018Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Stipulation (Regarding Factual Matters )
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Jury Instructions (REFUSED - 1 PAGE )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 05, 2018Stipulation
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Jury Question (for Plaintiff Nao Akimoto from jurors, 1, 3, 5, 6, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12 & Alt #2 )
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions (GIVEN - 32 PAGES )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation (RE: Jury (CIVIL TRIALS) )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions (WITHDRAWN - 8 PAGES )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Receipt (Jury fees $350.10 )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Jury Verdict
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Jury Question (for witness Negumi Akimoto from jurors 6,7, 12 & Alt #2 )
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation (Regarding Admissibility of Exhibits at trial )
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Receipt
Date: February 05, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Jury Question (for expert witness Dr, Nicholas Rose from jurors 3,5, 6, 12, & Alt #2 )
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Receipt (Jury Fees $350.10 receipt #SM20189006 )
Date: February 05, 2018Stipulation and Order (RE: RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation (Regarding Admissibility of Exhibits at trial )
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Stipulation (Regarding Factual Matters )
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Jury Question (for Plaintiff Nao Akimoto from jurors, 1, 3, 5, 6, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12 & Alt #2 )
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Jury Question (for witness Negumi Akimoto from jurors 6,7, 12 & Alt #2 )
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Receipt (Jury fees $350.10 )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE: RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation (RE: Jury (CIVIL TRIALS) )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions (GIVEN - 32 PAGES )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions (WITHDRAWN - 8 PAGES )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Receipt (Jury Fees $350.10 receipt #SM20189006 )
Date: February 05, 2018Jury Instructions (REFUSED - 1 PAGE )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.