Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Genorkova Nino, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zolonz Adam M. Esq., against Volkswagen Group Of America Inc., Mckenna Motor Company Inc., represented by Conboy Sean P. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara A. Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara A. Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2016 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time246 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: July 25, 2016Notice
Date: July 25, 2016Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: July 29, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: October 14, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.