Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ambers Robert, Ambers Zelda, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bank Of America N.A., represented by Ceperley Tim G. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management105 days |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2016 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time163 days |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Robert Ambers (Plaintiff); Zelda Ambers (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-07-22 00:00:00 | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Removal to Federal Court 163 Days | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Status Conference Stephanie M. Bowick 8:30 am | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Status Conference (Status Conference; Court makes order) - Status Conference (Status Conference; Court makes order) - |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Status Conference (Status Conference; Court makes order) - |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Stephanie M. Bowick 8:30 am | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-05-25 00:00:00 | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.