Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Blister Foshan Nanhai Pingzhou Minhang, Master China Industrial Limited, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Kmm Products, Kwong Morgan Nanking, Kwong Nancy Nandick, Kwon Rona Aka Kwong Run Hao Doe1, represented by Lee Green & Stewart, Wu Sam X.J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica Bachner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management113 days |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2016 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions798 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time947 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: December 19, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 01, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 12, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.