Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Meneses Robert, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Walter J. Wilson, against Bernal J. Arthur, Morales Raul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management98 days |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2016 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial430 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time355 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT, J. ARTHUR BERNAL
Date: July 05, 2016Notice
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-02-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: November 03, 2016Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 25, 2017Order
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.