Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sinani Peeyoneh, Soukhoundian Mikael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alder C. Michael Esq., Brock Cameron Yadidi, Saylor Jefferson, against Georgios Nassos Doe1, Lepore Frank, represented by Gates Peter John, Vasquez Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth Courthouse with Randy Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandy Rhodes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1021 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1021 days |
Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Election To Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6); Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Deborah L. Stough, CSR#8925; Filed by: Mikael Soukhoundian (Plaintiff); Peeyoneh Sinani (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Peeyoneh Sinani (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Reply to Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Mikael Soukhoundian (Plaintiff); Peeyoneh Sinani (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Mikael Soukhoundian (Plaintiff); Peeyoneh Sinani (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Ruling; Filed by: GEROGIOS NASSOS DOE1 (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Offer to Compromise; Filed by: Frank Lepore (Defendant); GEROGIOS NASSOS DOE1 (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Other - Stipulated Dismissal; Filed by: Mikael Soukhoundian (Plaintiff); Peeyoneh Sinani (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS; Filed by: GEROGIOS NASSOS DOE1 (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Defendant's Exhibit List; Filed by: GEROGIOS NASSOS DOE1 (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00no. 1; Filed by:
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Frank Lepore (Defendant); GEROGIOS NASSOS DOE1 (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 10, 2019Complaint
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Associated Counsel
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge Randy Rhodes, Department F51, Chatsworth; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Defendant's Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's MIL No. 6)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition (to plaintiff's motion in limine no. 8)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's MIL No. 3)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's MIL No. 2)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's MIL No. 1)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's MIL No. 5)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's MIL No. 4)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial (5-7) court days; PI/PD/WD))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Defendant's Objection and Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Quash Trial Subpoenas
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2018-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference / Jury Trial;))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Joint Page and Line Designation For Deposition Testimony
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference; Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial with a 5-7 day estimate))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Other - (Stipulated Dismissal)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Offer to Compromise
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (Of Defendant George Nassos To Plaintiffs' Motion For New Trial)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Randy Rhodes, Department F51, Chatsworth)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Other - (Joint page and line designation for deposition testimony)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict (P...))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Other - (Statutory Offer To Compromise C.C.P. Section 998 And Acceptance Of Offer)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Judgment Notwithstanding The Verdict)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Other - (Motion for Partial Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Reply (Reply re Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore, Deborah L. Stough, CSR#8925
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal
Date: April 10, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of 03/14/2019)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Reply (to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (Unlimited Civil))
Date: April 02, 2019Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: March 22, 2019Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: April 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.