Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Olympic Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Ketoret Inc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Charles F. Palmer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Palmer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management118 days |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions623 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time627 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL? CIVIL
Date: September 22, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: November 16, 2016Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Appellant
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Respondent
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by null
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B286128; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 05, 2019Motion for Leave Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Brief Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: August 30, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Court
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Respondent
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Appellant
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B286128) Filed by Clerk
Date: March 05, 2019Notice of Lien Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:Jury Question Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Verdict-Special Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Response Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Esq. THOMAS J. WEISS (Attorney)
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Olympic Holdings, LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Motion Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Order Filed by Ketoret, Inc (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B286128)
Date: March 05, 2019Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00
Date: August 30, 2018Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.