Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shahzad Tirmizi, Tirmizi Shahzad, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Carpenter Zuckerman & Rowley Llp, Law Offices Of Bob B. Khakshooy, against Birruerta Rigoberto, Kroger West, Ralphs, Ralphs Grocery Company, Rigoberto Birruerta, (total of 7) See All represented by Wolfe & Wyman Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Norman P. Tarle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman P. Tarle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2015 |
CategoryPremises Liablty (E.G. Slip & Fall (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1056 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeVerdict |
Case Cycle Time1019 days |
Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Ord for Asgnmt of Trial Judge
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTION FOR EXPERT WITNESS FARDAD MOBIN, M.D. )
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 12 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTIONS FOR EXPERT WITNESS ALAN M. STIZAK, M.D. 2 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Stip & Order-use CSR (Kristin Cyphers CSR# 13518 Tel: 310-347-7817 Kristin.CSR@gmail.com )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTIONS FOR EXPERT WITNESS ANDREW S. MORRIS, D.C. 2 PAGES. )
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (by hand of defendant's oppostions to plaintiffs motions in limine No. 10, 11 & 12 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST )
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions (48 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (7 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (9 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: September 12, 2018Jury Question
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit of Daily Jury Fees)
Date: August 07, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-10-22 00:00:00
Date: October 22, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 19, 2018Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FOR AUGUST 1, 2018 AND AUGUST 2, 2018 $429.80 )
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF SHAHZAD TIRMIZI. 2 PAGES. )
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (receipt, and order re release of civil exhibits )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Special Verdict (Form )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (by hand of defendant's oppostions to plaintiffs motions in limine No. 10, 11 & 12 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Stip & Order-use CSR (Kristin Cyphers CSR# 13518 Tel: 310-347-7817 Kristin.CSR@gmail.com )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 12 )
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST )
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTIONS FOR EXPERT WITNESS ANDREW S. MORRIS, D.C. 2 PAGES. )
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTION FOR EXPERT WITNESS FARDAD MOBIN, M.D. )
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTIONS FOR EXPERT WITNESS ALAN M. STIZAK, M.D. 2 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FOR AUGUST 1, 2018 AND AUGUST 2, 2018 $429.80 )
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Special Verdict (Form )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (9 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (7 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (48 PAGES )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Question (JUROR QUESTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF SHAHZAD TIRMIZI. 2 PAGES. )
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (receipt, and order re release of civil exhibits )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: September 12, 2018Other - (Civil Deposit of Daily Jury Fees)
Date: August 07, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.