Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Muttaraid Pattra, Muttaraid Tommy, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Arash Hakakzadeh, Hakakzadeh Arash, Law Offices Of Neil R. Anapol, Encino Law Firm, against Does 1-100, Park David, Parkside Enterprises Inc, Parkside Enterprises Inc., Parkside Roofing, (total of 5) See All represented by Ho Roland V Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Norman P. Tarle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman P. Tarle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time653 days |
Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED WITH A TOTAL COSTS OF $139,630. )
Date: August 21, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 28, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO DIPOSE OF EXHIBITS CONFORMED COPIES MAILED . )
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 28, 2017Settlement Conference Statement
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO DIPOSE OF EXHIBITS CONFORMED COPIES MAILED . ) Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: July 28, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-03-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement Filed by David Park (Defendant); Parkside Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Pattra Muttaraid (Plaintiff); Tommy Muttaraid (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Pattra Muttaraid (Plaintiff); Tommy Muttaraid (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Parkside Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); David Park (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO DIPOSE OF EXHIBITS CONFORMED COPIES MAILED 07/20/17. )
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED WITH A TOTAL COSTS OF $139,630. )
Date: August 21, 2017Memorandum of Costs (MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUMMARY RECEIVED WITH TOTAL COSTS OF $139,630. )
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.