Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Po Ronald, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Dewitt Algorri & Algorri, Pettit Kohn Ingrassia & Lutz Pc, against Barnhart School Dismissed, Santa Anita Church The, represented by Dewitt Algorri & Algorri Inc., Moreno Martin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Charles F. Palmer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Palmer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management952 days |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial693 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions964 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time964 days |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: March 13, 2018Complaint
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Judgment
Date: May 09, 2018Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 09, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.