Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Bagernis Michael Beal, City Of Pasadena, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bagneris Michele Beal, Slyngstad Charles Edward Jr, against Collins Electric, Collins Tyrone, Jenkins Melody, New Covenant Christian Fellowship Center, Southern California Evangelistic Juris-, (total of 7) See All represented by Green Noah, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management101 days |
Filing DateJune 23, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial476 days |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1847 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 04, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: September 08, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 07, 2019Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-19T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Document:Report-Joint Status-VELS Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Document:Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher Darden; Filed by: Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Other - Power of Attorney; Filed by: Danny R. Wooten (Defendant); Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney); As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00General Denial Filed by Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Noah Green (Attorney)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Noah Green (Attorney)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Status Report Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary Sanction...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-19T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Charles Edward Slyngstad, Jr (Attorney); City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Status Report Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Report-Joint Status-VELS Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Danny R. Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Receipt Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Notice Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Other - (Power of Attorney) Filed by Danny R. Wooten (Defendant); Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Darden) Filed by Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference Re: Lifting Parti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney); As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Status Report Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Report-Joint Status-VELS Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Danny R. Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Receipt Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Other - (Power of Attorney) Filed by Danny R. Wooten (Defendant); Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Status Report Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Noah Green (Attorney)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Noah Green (Attorney)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Darden) Filed by Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary Sanction...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Floyd Edward Aragon (Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00General Denial Filed by Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference Re: Lifting Parti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: As to: Tyrone Collins (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Melody Jenkins (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Complaint Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff); Michael Beal Bagernis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher Darden; Filed by: Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Charles Edward Slyngstad, Jr (Attorney); City of Pasadena (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Other - Power of Attorney; Filed by: Danny R. Wooten (Defendant); Laveta Wooten (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Report-Joint Status-VELS
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Status Report (re Status Conference)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference Re: Lifting Parti...))
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT FEBRUARY 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Darden)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary Sanction...))
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Status Report (REGARDING FEBRUARY 7, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages...))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 10, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Other - (Power of Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference Re: Lifting Parti...))
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Status Report (re 12/19/18 Status Conference)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Other - (Power of Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Darden)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages...))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT FEBRUARY 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Damages))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Status Report (REGARDING FEBRUARY 7, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary Sanction...))
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.